KY HB779 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-18 - signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-18 - signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Amends KRS 117.055, 117.0551, 117.0552, and 117.0557 to update terminology for precinct boundaries from a physical map to a digital file requirement.
Title
AN ACT relating to digital precinct boundary requirements.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-15 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 3326 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-11 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 258 (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2024-03-11 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 258 (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-18 | House | signed by Governor |
2024-04-15 | House | delivered to Governor |
2024-04-15 | House | enrolled, signed by President of the Senate |
2024-04-15 | House | enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House |
2024-04-15 | House | received in House |
2024-04-15 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 38-0 |
2024-04-15 | Senate | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Monday, April 15, 2024 |
2024-04-12 | Senate | reported favorably, 2nd reading, to Rules as a consent bill |
2024-03-28 | Senate | returned to State & Local Government (S) |
2024-03-28 | Senate | 1st reading |
2024-03-28 | Senate | taken from State & Local Government (S) |
2024-03-25 | Senate | to State & Local Government (S) |
2024-03-12 | Senate | to Committee on Committees (S) |
2024-03-12 | Senate | received in Senate |
2024-03-11 | House | 3rd reading, passed 93-0 |
2024-03-07 | House | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Friday, March 08, 2024 |
2024-03-07 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2024-03-06 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar |
2024-03-01 | House | to Local Government (H) |
2024-02-26 | House | to Committee on Committees (H) |
2024-02-26 | House | introduced in House |