KY HB82 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-02-22 - posted in committee
Pending: House Veterans, Military Affairs, & Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [MS Word]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-02-22 - posted in committee
Pending: House Veterans, Military Affairs, & Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [MS Word]
Summary
Amend KRS 40.353 to broaden the eligibility criteria for the Kentucky Medal for Freedom to include members of the Armed Forces, a state National Guard, or a Reserve Component who were buried in Kentucky on or after July 15, 2008, and have a surviving spouse or parent who is a Kentucky resident.
Title
AN ACT relating to military service.
Sponsors
Rep. Donna Mayfield [R] | Rep. Brent Yonts [D] | Rep. Regina Huff [R] | Sen. C.B. Embry [R] |
Rep. Kim King [R] | Rep. Tim Moore [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-02-22 | House | posted in committee |
2013-01-09 | House | to Veterans, Military Affairs, & Public Safety (H) |
2013-01-08 | House | introduced in House |
Kentucky State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/13RS/HB82.htm |
Text | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/13RS/HB82/bill.doc |