KY HCR76 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-3)
Status: Engrossed on January 30 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-02-01 - to Agriculture (S)
Pending: Senate Agriculture Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [MS Word]
Status: Engrossed on January 30 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-02-01 - to Agriculture (S)
Pending: Senate Agriculture Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [MS Word]
Summary
Urge a study of the growth of wild pig populations in Kentucky, addressing in particular the dangers and problems that wild swine present for the state's environment, farmers, landowners, and citizens.
Title
Urge a study of the growth of wild pig populations in Kentucky, addressing in particular the dangers and problems that wild swine present for the state's environment, farmers, landowners, and citizens.
Sponsors
Rep. Royce Adams [D] | Rep. Mitchel Denham [D] | Rep. Thomas McKee [D] | Rep. Terry Mills [D] |
Rep. Fred Nesler [D] | Rep. Ryan Quarles [R] | Rep. Rick Rand [D] | Rep. Steven Rudy [R] |
Rep. Wilson Stone [D] | Rep. Tommy Turner [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-01 | to Agriculture (S) | |
2012-01-30 | received in Senate | |
2012-01-30 | 3rd reading, adopted 94-0 | |
2012-01-26 | placed in the Orders of the Day | |
2012-01-26 | taken from Rules (H) | |
2012-01-26 | 2nd reading, to Rules | |
2012-01-25 | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar | |
2012-01-23 | posted in committee | |
2012-01-20 | to Agriculture & Small Business (H) | |
2012-01-18 | introduced in House |
Kentucky State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/12RS/HC76.htm |
Text | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/12RS/HC76/bill.doc |