KY HJR56 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Passed on April 4 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-04 - signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Passed on April 4 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-04 - signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Authorize the Office of State Budget Director to release a portion of the capital construction funds totaling $62,502,500 to the Department of Parks for specific upgrades; require action by the General Assembly to release the remaining funds appropriated by 2022 Ky. Acts ch. 199; require reporting on the status of state park projects by the Department of Parks to the Legislative Research Commission and the Interim Joint Committee on Appropriations and Revenue; APPROPRIATION; EMERGENCY.
Title
A JOINT RESOLUTION authorizing the release of capital construction funds to the Department of Parks for improvements to Kentucky State Parks and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Rep. Jason Petrie [R] | Rep. Adam Bowling [R] | Rep. Josh Bray [R] | Rep. Lindsey Burke [D] |
Rep. Kim King [R] | Rep. Nima Kulkarni [D] | Rep. Walker Thomas [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-03-28 - Senate - Senate: Adopt RSN# 3167 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-28 - House - House: Adopt RCS# 170 (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-28 - House - House: Adopt RCS# 170 (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-04 | House | signed by Governor |
2024-03-28 | House | delivered to Governor |
2024-03-28 | House | enrolled, signed by President of the Senate |
2024-03-28 | House | enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House |
2024-03-28 | House | received in House |
2024-03-28 | Senate | 3rd reading, adopted 38-0 |
2024-03-28 | Senate | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Thursday, March 28, 2024 |
2024-03-28 | Senate | reported favorably, to Rules |
2024-03-08 | Senate | returned to Appropriations & Revenue (S) |
2024-03-08 | Senate | 2nd reading |
2024-03-08 | Senate | taken from Appropriations & Revenue (S) |
2024-03-07 | Senate | returned to Appropriations & Revenue (S) |
2024-03-07 | Senate | 1st reading |
2024-03-07 | Senate | taken from Appropriations & Revenue (S) |
2024-03-04 | Senate | to Appropriations & Revenue (S) |
2024-02-29 | Senate | to Committee on Committees (S) |
2024-02-29 | Senate | received in Senate |
2024-02-28 | House | 3rd reading, adopted 98-0 with Committee Substitute (1) |
2024-02-27 | House | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Wednesday, February 28, 2024 |
2024-02-27 | House | reported favorably, to Rules with Committee Substitute (1) |
2024-02-02 | House | recommitted to Appropriations & Revenue (H) |
2024-02-01 | House | floor amendment (1) filed |
2024-02-01 | House | reported favorably, to Rules |
2024-01-31 | House | returned to Appropriations & Revenue (H) |
2024-01-31 | House | 2nd reading |
2024-01-31 | House | taken from Appropriations & Revenue (H) |
2024-01-30 | House | to Appropriations & Revenue (H) |
2024-01-30 | House | returned to Committee on Committees (H) |
2024-01-30 | House | 1st reading |
2024-01-30 | House | taken from Committee on Committees (H) |
2024-01-26 | House | to Committee on Committees (H) |
2024-01-26 | House | introduced in House |
Subjects
Appropriations
Budget and Financial Administration
Capital Construction
Effective Dates, Emergency
Parks and Shrines
Public Buildings and Grounds
Reports Mandated
State Agencies
Budget and Financial Administration
Capital Construction
Effective Dates, Emergency
Parks and Shrines
Public Buildings and Grounds
Reports Mandated
State Agencies