KY SB132 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 13 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-13 - signed by Governor (Acts ch. 134)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [MS Word]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 13 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-13 - signed by Governor (Acts ch. 134)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [MS Word]
Summary
Create new sections of KRS Chapter 157 to support and encourage the construction and renovation of school buildings using efficient design concepts; establish a Kentucky efficient school design trust fund; require the Department of Education to develop and publish guidelines for efficient school design; require the Department of Education to provide annual reports.
Title
AN ACT relating to efficient design in school buildings and making an appropriation therefor.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-13 | signed by Governor (Acts ch. 134) | |
2010-04-01 | delivered to Governor | |
2010-04-01 | enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House | |
2010-03-29 | enrolled, signed by President of the Senate | |
2010-03-29 | passed 37-0 | |
2010-03-29 | Senate concurred in House Committee Substitute, committee amendments (1) and (2-title) | |
2010-03-29 | posted for passage for concurrence in House Committee Substitute, committee amendments (1) and (2-title) | |
2010-03-26 | received in Senate | |
2010-03-25 | 3rd reading, passed 99-0 with Committee Substitute, committee amendments (1) and (2-title) | |
2010-03-24 | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Thursday, March 25, 2010 | |
2010-03-24 | 2nd reading, to Rules | |
2010-03-23 | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar with Committee Substitute, committee amendments (1) and (2-title) | |
2010-03-18 | posted in committee | |
2010-02-22 | to Education (H) | |
2010-02-19 | received in House | |
2010-02-18 | 3rd reading, passed 38-0 with committee amendment (1), floor amendment (1) | |
2010-02-17 | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Thursday, February 18, 2010 | |
2010-02-12 | floor amendment (1) filed | |
2010-02-11 | 2nd reading, to Rules | |
2010-02-10 | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with committee amendment (1) | |
2010-02-08 | to Natural Resources and Energy (S) | |
2010-02-04 | introduced in Senate |
Kentucky State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/10RS/SB132.htm |
Text | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/10RS/SB132/bill.doc |