KY SB137 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-08 - to Banking & Insurance (S)
Pending: Senate Banking and Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-08 - to Banking & Insurance (S)
Pending: Senate Banking and Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Amend KRS 304.39-020 to make technical changes; to define CMS revenue codes, current procedural terminology, healthcare common procedure acting system, health care provider or provider, and international statistical classification of disease; to change the definition of medical expense; amend KRS 304.39-130 to increase weekly limit for basic reparation benefits payable for certain losses to $400; amend KRS 304.39-210 to establish rate at which medical expenses shall be paid; amend KRS 304.39-241 to make technical correction; amend KRS 304.39-245 to prohibit providers from charging in excess of the amount allowed under the subtitle for medical expenses, to balance bill a person for an excess amount above what is allowed by the subtitle, and to prohibit the reporting of a failure to pay an amount beyond what is allowed by this subtitle; create a new section of Subtitle 39 of KRS Chapter 304 to require the Department of Insurance to report certain information to the General Assembly this section to expire on January 1, 2026; repeal Section 6 of this Act as codified, effective 1/1/2026; EFFECTIVE January 1, 2020.
Title
AN ACT relating to the motor vehicle reparations act.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-08 | Senate | to Banking & Insurance (S) |
2019-02-06 | Senate | introduced in Senate |
Subjects
Effective Dates, Delayed
Health and Medical Services
Insurance, Motor Vehicle
Motor Vehicles
Physicians and Practitioners
Health and Medical Services
Insurance, Motor Vehicle
Motor Vehicles
Physicians and Practitioners
Kentucky State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://apps.legislature.ky.gov/record/19RS/sb137.html |
Text | https://apps.legislature.ky.gov/recorddocuments/bill/19RS/sb137/orig_bill.pdf |