KY SB145 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-04 - to Licensing & Occupations (H)
Pending: House Licensing and Occupations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [MS Word]
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-04 - to Licensing & Occupations (H)
Pending: House Licensing and Occupations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [MS Word]
Summary
Amend KRS 242.020 to require that any group of citizens that wants to circulate a petition for a local option election must first file with the county clerk before signatures are collected; require that they post a bond with the Circuit Court to cover all costs of the election within 5 days of filing such a petition, if the election will be held on any day other than a primary or regular election date; require that petitions have the signature and legibly printed name of the voter and the year of the voter's birth; require that if such an election is held on other than a primary or regular election date the group of citizens circulating the petition will pay for the costs of the election; amend KRS 242.030 to permit a local option question to be placed on a ballot on a primary or a regular election day and to establish deadlines and procedures for the filing of petitions; amend KRS 242.022, 242.1242, and 242.1244 to conform.
Title
AN ACT relating to elections.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-04 | House | to Licensing & Occupations (H) |
2015-03-03 | House | received in House |
2015-03-02 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 36-0 |
2015-02-27 | Senate | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Monday, March 2, 2015 |
2015-02-25 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2015-02-24 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar |
2015-02-12 | Senate | to State & Local Government (S) |
2015-02-10 | Senate | introduced in Senate |