KY SB147 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 26 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-02-27 - to Appropriations & Revenue (H)
Pending: House Appropriations and Revenue Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Amend KRS 139.480 to exempt from sales and use tax tangible personal property purchased by a person for incorporation into a structure or improvement to real property under a contract with the federal, state, or local government, or a resident, nonprofit educational, charitable, or religious institution; apply to sales made after July 1, 2019, but before July 1, 2023; require the Department of Revenue to report the claimed exemptions to the Interim Joint Committee on Appropriations and Revenue; amend KRS 131.190 to give the Department authority to provide the report to LRC.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT relating to sales and use tax exemptions.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 854 (Y: 26 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-27Houseto Appropriations & Revenue (H)
2019-02-26Housereceived in House
2019-02-25Senate3rd reading, passed 26-7
2019-02-22Senateposted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Monday, February 25, 2019
2019-02-21Senate2nd reading, to Rules
2019-02-20Senatereported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar
2019-02-11Senateto Appropriations & Revenue (S)
2019-02-08Senateintroduced in Senate

Subjects


Kentucky State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback