KY SB164 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 26 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-26 - signed by Governor (KY Acts ch. 142)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 26 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-26 - signed by Governor (KY Acts ch. 142)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Repeal KRS 160.325, which requires every board of education to enroll in the Kentucky Energy Efficiency Program.
Title
AN ACT relating to the Kentucky Energy Efficiency Program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-14 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 368 (Y: 86 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2019-02-28 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 887 (Y: 36 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-28 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 887 (Y: 36 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-26 | Senate | signed by Governor (KY Acts ch. 142) |
2019-03-14 | Senate | delivered to Governor |
2019-03-14 | Senate | enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House |
2019-03-14 | Senate | enrolled, signed by President of the Senate |
2019-03-14 | Senate | received in Senate |
2019-03-14 | House | 3rd reading, passed 86-3 |
2019-03-12 | House | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Wednesday, March 13, 2019 |
2019-03-12 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2019-03-07 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar |
2019-03-05 | House | posted in committee |
2019-03-01 | House | to Natural Resources & Energy (H) |
2019-02-28 | House | received in House |
2019-02-28 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 36-1 |
2019-02-28 | Senate | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Thursday, February 28, 2019 |
2019-02-26 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2019-02-25 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar |
2019-02-13 | Senate | to Natural Resources & Energy (S) |
2019-02-11 | Senate | introduced in Senate |