KY SB168 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 12 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-25 - returned to State & Local Government (S)
Pending: Senate State & Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 12 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-25 - returned to State & Local Government (S)
Pending: Senate State & Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Amend KRS 21.540, 61.661, and 161.585 to require the Judicial Form Retirement System, the Kentucky Retirement Systems, and the Teachers' Retirement System to disclose upon request the names, status, projected or actual benefit payments, and other retirement information of any member, inactive member, or retiree of a retirement system or plan; EFFECTIVE January 1, 2020.
Title
AN ACT relating to the disclosure of public retirement information.
Sponsors
Sen. Tom Buford [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-25 | Senate | returned to State & Local Government (S) |
2019-02-25 | Senate | 2nd reading |
2019-02-25 | Senate | taken from State & Local Government (S) |
2019-02-22 | Senate | returned to State & Local Government (S) |
2019-02-22 | Senate | 1st reading |
2019-02-22 | Senate | taken from State & Local Government (S) |
2019-02-14 | Senate | to State & Local Government (S) |
2019-02-12 | Senate | introduced in Senate |
Subjects
Kentucky State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://apps.legislature.ky.gov/record/19RS/sb168.html |
Text | https://apps.legislature.ky.gov/recorddocuments/bill/19RS/sb168/orig_bill.pdf |