KY SB191 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 18 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-17 - recommitted to Judiciary (S)
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 18 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-17 - recommitted to Judiciary (S)
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Create new sections of KRS Chapter 381 to define terms related to planned communities; require planned communities to file a declaration in the office of the county clerk or clerks where the planned community is located; provide for homeowners' associations duties and responsibilities; provide for owners' and prospective purchasers' or their agents' right to examine and copy certain records of the homeowners' association; provide for annual assessments of each lot to be equal unless established otherwise in the declaration or the governing documents of the homeowners' association; provide guidelines for revitalization of defunct declarations and homeowners' associations; establish guidelines for civil liabilities of planned communities and homeowners' association; provide for damages to be paid to homeowners' associations when any portion of a common area is taken or damaged under the power of eminent domain; provide that a homeowners' association shall not prohibit the outdoor display of political yard signs from 30 days before any primary, regular election, or special election until seven days after that election.
Title
AN ACT relating to residential communities.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-17 | Senate | recommitted to Judiciary (S) |
2022-03-10 | Senate | floor amendment (1) filed |
2022-03-04 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2022-03-03 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar |
2022-02-22 | Senate | to Judiciary (S) |
2022-02-18 | Senate | to Committee on Committees (S) |
2022-02-18 | Senate | introduced in Senate |