KY SB196 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 2 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-16 - WITHDRAWN
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [MS Word]
Status: Introduced on March 2 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-16 - WITHDRAWN
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [MS Word]
Summary
Amend KRS 150.010 to add definitions; create a new section of KRS Chapter 150 to establish hunter education course completion card requirements; provide for exemptions from course completion card requirements; allow for those born before January 1, 1975, who are exempt from hunter education course completion card requirements to accompany up to two children under the age of 12; amend KRS 186.675 to conform.
Title
AN ACT relating to hunting.
Sponsors
Sen. Mike Wilson [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-16 | WITHDRAWN | |
2012-03-05 | returned to Natural Resources & Energy (S) | |
2012-03-05 | 1st reading | |
2012-03-05 | taken from Natural Resources & Energy (S) | |
2012-03-05 | to Natural Resources & Energy (S) | |
2012-03-02 | introduced in Senate |
Kentucky State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/12RS/SB196.htm |
Text | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/12RS/SB196/bill.doc |