KY SB25 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 26 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-03-12 - returned to Appropriations & Revenue (H)
Pending: House Appropriations and Revenue Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Create a new section of KRS Chapter 65A to require proposed increases in ad valorem taxes and certain fees and the levy of new ad valorem taxes or fees by special purpose governmental entities to be submitted to the legislative body of the county or city in which the special purpose governmental entity is located for review; amend various sections of the Kentucky Revised Statutes to conform; repeal KRS 65A.100; EFFECTIVE January 1, 2020.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT relating to special purpose governmental entities.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 850 (Y: 25 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-12Housereturned to Appropriations & Revenue (H)
2019-03-12House1st reading
2019-03-12Housetaken from Appropriations & Revenue (H)
2019-02-27Houseto Appropriations & Revenue (H)
2019-02-26Housereceived in House
2019-02-25Senate3rd reading, passed 25-11
2019-02-25Senateposted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Monday, February 25, 2019
2019-02-21Senate2nd reading, to Rules
2019-02-20Senatereported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar
2019-01-09Senateto State & Local Government (S)
2019-01-08Senateintroduced in Senate
2018-12-13SenatePrefiled by the sponsor(s).

Subjects


Kentucky State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback