KY SB25 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 25 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-01-25 - to Committee on Committees (H)
Pending: House Committee On Committees Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on January 25 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-01-25 - to Committee on Committees (H)
Pending: House Committee On Committees Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Create new sections of KRS Chapter 383 to prohibit local governments from adopting or enforcing an ordinance that requires a landlord to participate in a housing program under Section 8 of the United States Housing Act of 1937; prohibit local governments from adopting or enforcing an ordinance relating to landlord and tenant laws that is in conflict with state law.
Title
AN ACT relating to local landlord and tenant ordinances.
Sponsors
Sen. Steve West [R] | Sen. Gary Boswell [R] | Sen. Matthew Deneen [R] | Sen. Donald Douglas [R] |
Sen. Mike Wilson [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-01-24 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 2876 (Y: 30 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-25 | House | to Committee on Committees (H) |
2024-01-25 | House | received in House |
2024-01-24 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 30-6 |
2024-01-23 | Senate | passed over and retained in the Orders of the Day |
2024-01-22 | Senate | passed over and retained in the Orders of the Day |
2024-01-19 | Senate | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Monday, January 22, 2024 |
2024-01-18 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2024-01-17 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar |
2024-01-16 | Senate | to State & Local Government (S) |
2024-01-11 | Senate | to Committee on Committees (S) |
2024-01-11 | Senate | introduced in Senate |
Subjects
Cities
Consolidated Local Governments
Counties
Counties, Charter
Counties, Urban
Landlord and Tenant
Local Government
Local Mandate
Unified Local Governments
Consolidated Local Governments
Counties
Counties, Charter
Counties, Urban
Landlord and Tenant
Local Government
Local Mandate
Unified Local Governments