KY SB28 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Introduced on January 4 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-09 - recommitted to Appropriations & Revenue (S)
Pending: Senate Appropriations and Revenue Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 4 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-09 - recommitted to Appropriations & Revenue (S)
Pending: Senate Appropriations and Revenue Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Amend KRS 278.170 to allow a utility to grant free or reduced rate service to any commercial food production operation that produces food items intended for human consumption, subject to the Public Service Commission approval of the tariff.
Title
AN ACT relating to water rates.
Sponsors
Sen. Rick Girdler [R] | Sen. Paul Hornback [R] | Sen. Julie Raque Adams [R] | Sen. Stephen Meredith [R] |
Sen. Dennis Parrett [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-09 | Senate | recommitted to Appropriations & Revenue (S) |
2022-02-03 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2022-02-02 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar |
2022-01-06 | Senate | to Natural Resources & Energy (S) |
2022-01-04 | Senate | to Committee on Committees (S) |
2022-01-04 | Senate | introduced in Senate |
Subjects
Agriculture
Animals, Livestock, and Poultry
Cooperatives
Foods
Local Mandate
Public Utilities
Water Supply
Animals, Livestock, and Poultry
Cooperatives
Foods
Local Mandate
Public Utilities
Water Supply