KY SB280 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 5 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-05 - signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 5 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-05 - signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Create a new section of KRS Chapter 205 to establish that a Level II verified trauma center that partners with a public or private university to establish a medical residency program shall be entitled to the university hospital reimbursement rate for any services delivered as part of that residency program.
Title
AN ACT relating to health facilities.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-27 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading W/FINAL hcs1 RSN# 3109 (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-03-26 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 362 (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2024-03-15 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 3006 (Y: 36 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-03-26 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 362 (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2024-03-15 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 3006 (Y: 36 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-05 | Senate | signed by Governor |
2024-03-28 | Senate | delivered to Governor |
2024-03-28 | Senate | enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House |
2024-03-27 | Senate | enrolled, signed by President of the Senate |
2024-03-27 | Senate | passed 35-0 with Committee Substitute (1) |
2024-03-27 | Senate | Senate concurred in House Committee Substitute (1) |
2024-03-27 | Senate | posted for passage for concurrence in House Committee Substitute (1) |
2024-03-26 | Senate | to Rules (S) |
2024-03-26 | Senate | received in Senate |
2024-03-26 | House | 3rd reading, passed 95-0 with Committee Substitute (1) |
2024-03-26 | House | placed in the Orders of the Day |
2024-03-26 | House | taken from Rules |
2024-03-25 | House | reported favorably, to Rules with Committee Substitute (1) |
2024-03-22 | House | returned to Health Services (H) |
2024-03-22 | House | 2nd reading |
2024-03-22 | House | taken from Health Services (H) |
2024-03-21 | House | to Health Services (H) |
2024-03-21 | House | returned to Committee on Committees (H) |
2024-03-21 | House | 1st reading |
2024-03-21 | House | taken from Committee on Committees (H) |
2024-03-15 | House | to Committee on Committees (H) |
2024-03-15 | House | received in House |
2024-03-15 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 36-1 with Committee Substitute (1), Floor Amendment (1) and Committee Amendment (1-title) |
2024-03-14 | Senate | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Friday, March 15, 2024 |
2024-03-14 | Senate | floor amendment (1) filed to Committee Substitute |
2024-03-14 | Senate | reported favorably, to Rules with Committee Substitute (1) and Committee Amendment (1-title) |
2024-03-12 | Senate | returned to Health Services (S) |
2024-03-12 | Senate | 2nd reading |
2024-03-12 | Senate | taken from Health Services (S) |
2024-03-11 | Senate | returned to Health Services (S) |
2024-03-11 | Senate | 1st reading |
2024-03-11 | Senate | taken from Health Services (S) |
2024-02-28 | Senate | to Health Services (S) |
2024-02-26 | Senate | to Committee on Committees (S) |
2024-02-26 | Senate | introduced in Senate |