KY SB29 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-4)
Status: Engrossed on January 21 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-01-26 - to Military Affairs & Public Safety (H)
Pending: House Military Affairs and Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [MS Word]
Status: Engrossed on January 21 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-01-26 - to Military Affairs & Public Safety (H)
Pending: House Military Affairs and Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [MS Word]
Summary
Amend KRS 18A.150 to expand the state hiring preference honoring military service; require the adding of five or ten preference points to a military-connected individual's examination score used for state hiring in classified positions; permit the total of an examination score and preference points to exceed 100; require that a register certificate of finalists for a state job identify all finalists entitled to preference points, whether or not an examination is actually a part of the selection method; require that an employing state agency offer an interview to all finalists entitled to preference points unless five or more of the finalists are entitled preference points, in which case, the employing state agency shall offer an interview to no fewer than five.
Title
AN ACT relating to honoring military service.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-01-26 | to Military Affairs & Public Safety (H) | |
2010-01-21 | received in House | |
2010-01-21 | 3rd reading, passed 37-0 | |
2010-01-20 | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Thursday, January 21, 2010 | |
2010-01-15 | 2nd reading, to Rules | |
2010-01-14 | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar | |
2010-01-06 | to Veterans, Military Affairs, & Public Protection (S) | |
2010-01-05 | introduced in Senate |
Kentucky State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/10RS/SB29.htm |
Text | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/10RS/SB29/bill.doc |