KY SB38 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 19 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-19 - signed by Governor (Acts ch. 150)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [MS Word]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 19 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-19 - signed by Governor (Acts ch. 150)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [MS Word]
Summary
Amend KRS 158.812 to express legislative goals for career and technical education; amend KRS 158.810 to define terms related to career and technical education; create a new section of KRS Chapter 156 to require the Department of Education to issue core content standards, assess student progress, and develop new courses relevant to college and career readiness; create a new section of KRS Chapter 158 providing for the creation and use of evidence-based models assessing the needs of at-risk students; create a new section of KRS Chapter 157 to define terms related to career and technical education and to establish a career and technical education accessibility fund; amend KRS 158.814 to address unmet needs for career and technical education; amend KRS 158.816 to add criteria to the assessment of technical education students; amend KRS 18A.010 to exempt technology center employees from the count of full-time executive branch employees; EMERGENCY.
Title
AN ACT relating to career pathways, making an appropriation therefor, and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-19 | signed by Governor (Acts ch. 150) | |
2012-04-12 | delivered to Governor | |
2012-04-12 | enrolled, signed by each presiding officer | |
2012-04-12 | received in Senate | |
2012-03-30 | passed 80-0 | |
2012-03-30 | House receded from Committee Substitute, committee amendment (2) | |
2012-03-30 | posted for passage for receding from House Committee Substitute, committee amendment (2-title) | |
2012-03-30 | received in House | |
2012-03-30 | Conference Committee appointed in Senate | |
2012-03-30 | Senate refused to concur in House Committee Substitute, committee amendment (2-title) | |
2012-03-30 | posted for passage for concurrence in House Committee Substitute, committee amendment (2) | |
2012-03-29 | received in Senate | |
2012-03-28 | 3rd reading, passed 96-0 with Committee Substitute, committee amendment (2-title) | |
2012-03-28 | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Wednesday, March 28, 2012 | |
2012-03-27 | reported favorably, 2nd reading, to Rules with Committee Substitute, committee amendments (1) and (2-title) | |
2012-03-26 | returned to Education (H) | |
2012-03-26 | 1st reading | |
2012-03-26 | taken from Education (H) | |
2012-03-20 | posted in committee | |
2012-02-14 | to Education (H) | |
2012-02-09 | received in House | |
2012-02-08 | 3rd reading, passed 36-0 with committee amendment (1-title) | |
2012-02-07 | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Wednesday, February 8, 2012 | |
2012-02-06 | 2nd reading, to Rules | |
2012-02-02 | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with committee amendment (1-title) | |
2012-01-19 | reassigned to Education (S) | |
2012-01-03 | to Appropriations & Revenue (S) | |
2012-01-03 | introduced in Senate | |
2012-10-05 | To: Interim Joint Committee on Education |
Kentucky State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/12RS/SB38.htm |
Text | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/12RS/SB38/bill.doc |