KY SB47 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 20 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-20 - signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 040)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [MS Word]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 20 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-20 - signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 040)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [MS Word]
Summary
Amend KRS 344.200 to require the Human Rights Commission to make reasonable accommodations to assist persons with disabilities in filing a complaint.
Title
AN ACT relating to persons with disabilities.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-20 | Senate | signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 040) |
2015-03-11 | Senate | delivered to Governor |
2015-03-11 | Senate | enrolled, signed by each presiding officer |
2015-03-11 | Senate | received in Senate |
2015-03-11 | House | 3rd reading, passed 97-0 |
2015-03-10 | House | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Wednesday, March 11, 2015 |
2015-03-10 | House | reported favorably, to Rules |
2015-03-09 | House | returned to Judiciary (H) |
2015-03-09 | House | 2nd reading |
2015-03-09 | House | taken from Judiciary (H) |
2015-03-04 | House | posting waived |
2015-03-04 | House | returned to Judiciary (H) |
2015-03-04 | House | 1st reading |
2015-03-04 | House | taken from Judiciary (H) |
2015-03-04 | House | to Judiciary (H) |
2015-03-03 | House | received in House |
2015-03-02 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 33-2 |
2015-03-02 | Senate | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Monday, March 2, 2015 |
2015-02-27 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2015-02-26 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar |
2015-02-03 | Senate | to Judiciary (S) |
2015-01-06 | Senate | introduced in Senate |
Kentucky State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/15RS/SB47.htm |
Text | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/15RS/SB47/bill.doc |
Supplement | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/15RS/SB47/vote_history.pdf |