KY SB47 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-22 - recommitted to Judiciary (S)
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 6 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-22 - recommitted to Judiciary (S)
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
Amend KRS 29A.040 to add holders of adult personal identification cards issued within a county to the master list of potential jurors for that county.
Title
AN ACT relating to juries.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-22 | Senate | recommitted to Judiciary (S) |
2016-01-25 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2016-01-21 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar |
2016-01-07 | Senate | to Judiciary (S) |
2016-01-06 | Senate | introduced in Senate |
Kentucky State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/16RS/SB47.htm |
Text | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/16RS/SB47/bill.doc |
Text | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/16RS/SB47/bill.pdf |