KY SB5 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 30-8)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-01-12 - replaced by identical House Bill 5
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-01-12 - replaced by identical House Bill 5
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Appropriate moneys to the West Kentucky State Aid Funding for Emergencies (SAFE) fund; create a new section of KRS Chapter 39A to create the West Kentucky SAFE fund; APPROPRIATION; EMERGENCY.
Title
AN ACT relating to fiscal matters providing funding for disaster recovery and relief, making an appropriation therefor, and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-01-12 - Senate - Senate: Motion to Substitute RSN# 1950 (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-12 | Senate | replaced by identical House Bill 5 |
2022-01-12 | Senate | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Wednesday, January 12, 2022 |
2022-01-12 | Senate | reported favorably, to Rules with Committee Substitute (2) |
2022-01-10 | Senate | returned to Appropriations & Revenue (S) |
2022-01-10 | Senate | 2nd reading |
2022-01-10 | Senate | taken from Appropriations & Revenue (S) |
2022-01-10 | Senate | to Appropriations & Revenue (S) |
2022-01-08 | Senate | returned to Committee on Committees (S) |
2022-01-08 | Senate | 1st reading |
2022-01-08 | Senate | taken from Committee on Committees (S) |
2022-01-08 | Senate | to Committee on Committees (S) |
2022-01-08 | Senate | introduced in Senate |
Subjects
Appropriations
Budget and Financial Administration
Disasters
Effective Dates, Emergency
Military Affairs and Civil Defense
Budget and Financial Administration
Disasters
Effective Dates, Emergency
Military Affairs and Civil Defense