KY SB53 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on January 29 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-21 - posted in committee
Pending: House Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [MS Word]
Status: Engrossed on January 29 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-21 - posted in committee
Pending: House Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [MS Word]
Summary
Amend KRS 65.003 to include subpoena power in urban-county and consolidated local government ethics codes.
Title
AN ACT relating to codes of ethics.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-21 | House | posted in committee |
2014-02-03 | House | to Local Government (H) |
2014-01-29 | House | received in House |
2014-01-28 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 36-0 |
2014-01-27 | Senate | passed over and retained in the Orders of the Day |
2014-01-24 | Senate | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Monday, January 27, 2014 |
2014-01-23 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2014-01-22 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar |
2014-01-13 | Senate | to State & Local Government (S) |
2014-01-07 | Senate | introduced in Senate |
Kentucky State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/14RS/SB53.htm |
Text | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/14RS/SB53/bill.doc |
Supplement | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/14RS/SB53/vote_history.pdf |