KY SB54 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 19 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-25 - returned to Health & Welfare (H)
Pending: House Health and Welfare Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [MS Word]
Status: Engrossed on February 19 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-25 - returned to Health & Welfare (H)
Pending: House Health and Welfare Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [MS Word]
Summary
Amend KRS 199.896 to require licensed child-care centers and certified family child-care homes that provide instructional and educational programs that operate for a maximum of 20 hours per week and which a child attends for no more than 16 hours per week be exempted from the licensure requirements of 922 KAR 2:090, 922 KAR 2:110, and 922 KAR 2:120.
Title
AN ACT relating to child-care facility administrative regulations.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-25 | House | returned to Health & Welfare (H) |
2014-03-25 | House | 2nd reading |
2014-03-25 | House | taken from Health & Welfare (H) |
2014-03-24 | House | returned to Health & Welfare (H) |
2014-03-24 | House | 1st reading |
2014-03-24 | House | taken from Health & Welfare (H) |
2014-02-25 | House | posted in committee |
2014-02-20 | House | to Health & Welfare (H) |
2014-02-19 | House | received in House |
2014-02-18 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 36-0 with floor amendment (1) |
2014-02-14 | Senate | floor amendment (1) filed |
2014-02-14 | Senate | passed over and retained in the Orders of the Day |
2014-02-13 | Senate | passed over and retained in the Orders of the Day |
2014-02-13 | Senate | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Thursday, February 13, 2014 |
2014-02-06 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2014-02-05 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar |
2014-01-13 | Senate | to Health & Welfare (S) |
2014-01-07 | Senate | introduced in Senate |