KY SB56 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Independent 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 24 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-15 - floor amendments (3) and (4-title) filed
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [MS Word]
Status: Engrossed on February 24 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-15 - floor amendments (3) and (4-title) filed
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [MS Word]
Summary
Amend KRS 224.01-530 to require use of Regional Screening Level Table for US EPA Region 3 rather than Region 9 and the guidance in the Risk-Based Concentration Table User's Guide rather than the Region 9 Preliminary Remediation Goals.
Title
AN ACT relating to environmental protection.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-15 | floor amendments (3) and (4-title) filed | |
2010-04-14 | floor amendments (1) and (2-title) filed | |
2010-04-14 | taken from Committee, placed in the Orders of the Day | |
2010-03-29 | recommitted to Appropriations & Revenue (H) | |
2010-03-29 | taken from the Regular Orders of the Day | |
2010-03-15 | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Tuesday, March 16, 2010 | |
2010-03-12 | 2nd reading, to Rules | |
2010-03-11 | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar | |
2010-03-04 | posted in committee | |
2010-02-26 | to Natural Resources & Environment (H) | |
2010-02-24 | received in House | |
2010-02-23 | 3rd reading, passed 38-0 with Committee Substitute | |
2010-02-22 | passed over and retained in the Orders of the Day | |
2010-02-18 | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Monday, February 22, 2010 | |
2010-02-11 | 2nd reading, to Rules | |
2010-02-10 | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar with Committee Substitute | |
2010-01-06 | to Natural Resources and Energy (S) | |
2010-01-05 | introduced in Senate |
Kentucky State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/10RS/SB56.htm |
Text | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/10RS/SB56/bill.doc |