KY SB62 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 22 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-05 - taken from the Consent Orders of the Day, placed in the Regular Orders of the Day
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [MS Word]
Status: Engrossed on February 22 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-05 - taken from the Consent Orders of the Day, placed in the Regular Orders of the Day
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [MS Word]
Summary
Amend KRS 11.200 to reduce from 30 members of the Commission on Small Business Advocacy to 13 members appointed by the Governor, with two members representing each congressional district and one at-large member; attach the Commission on Small Business Advocacy to the Department for Business Development; amend KRS 12.020 to abolish the Office of Research and Information Technology, the Department for New Business Development, the Department of Financial Incentives, the Department for Existing Business Development, and the Department of Commercialization and Innovation; create the Office of the Secretary and establish within the Office of the Secretary the Office of Research and Public Affairs, the Office of Commercialization and Innovation, the Office of Compliance, Finance and Administrative Services, and the Department for Business Development; amend various sections of KRS Chapter 154 to conform; repeal KRS 154.12-216, which establishes the Business Information Clearinghouse; repeal KRS 154.12-222, which establishes the Office of Administration and Support; repeal KRS 154.12-224, which establishes the Department of Financial Incentives; repeal KRS 154.12-225, which establishes the Department for New Business Development; confirm Resolution 12-03 of the Kentucky Economic Development Partnership, dated June 27, 2012.
Title
AN ACT relating to the reorganization of the Cabinet for Economic Development.
Sponsors
Sen. Alice Kerr [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-05 | House | taken from the Consent Orders of the Day, placed in the Regular Orders of the Day |
2013-03-05 | House | floor amendments (2) and (3-title) filed |
2013-03-04 | House | floor amendment (1) withdrawn |
2013-03-04 | House | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Wednesday, March 6, 2013 |
2013-03-01 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2013-02-28 | House | floor amendment (1) filed |
2013-02-28 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar |
2013-02-27 | House | posting waived |
2013-02-25 | House | to Economic Development (H) |
2013-02-22 | House | received in House |
2013-02-21 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 38-0 |
2013-02-20 | Senate | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Thursday, February 21, 2013 |
2013-02-15 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2013-02-14 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar |
2013-02-07 | Senate | to Economic Development, Tourism & Labor (S) |
2013-02-05 | Senate | introduced in Senate |