KY SB62 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 29 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-29 - became law without Governor's Signature (Acts Ch. 127)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 29 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-29 - became law without Governor's Signature (Acts Ch. 127)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Create new sections of KRS Chapter 61 to define terms; prohibit a public agency from requiring an individual or nonprofit organization to compel the release of personal information, release personal information in possession of the agency, or require a contractor or grantee with the public agency to provide a list of nonprofit organizations to which it provides financial support; create exceptions; create penalties; and include a severability clause; SHORT TITLE.
Title
AN ACT relating to privacy.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-03-15 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 2644 (Y: 27 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-03-14 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 234 (Y: 93 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading W/scs1 RSN# 2490 (Y: 31 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-14 - House - House: Third Reading RCS# 234 (Y: 93 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading W/scs1 RSN# 2490 (Y: 31 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-29 | Senate | became law without Governor's Signature (Acts Ch. 127) |
2023-03-28 | Senate | filed without Governor's signature with the Secretary of State |
2023-03-16 | Senate | delivered to Governor |
2023-03-16 | Senate | enrolled, signed by Speaker of the House |
2023-03-16 | Senate | enrolled, signed by President of the Senate |
2023-03-15 | Senate | passed 27 -6 |
2023-03-15 | Senate | Senate concurred in House Floor Amendment (1) |
2023-03-15 | Senate | posted for passage for concurrence in House Floor Amendment (1) |
2023-03-15 | Senate | to Rules (S) |
2023-03-15 | Senate | received in Senate |
2023-03-14 | House | 3rd reading, passed 93-6 with Floor Amendment (1) |
2023-03-10 | House | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Monday, March 13, 2023 |
2023-03-10 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2023-03-09 | House | floor amendment (1) filed |
2023-03-09 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar |
2023-03-08 | House | to Elections, Const. Amendments & Intergovernmental Affairs (H) |
2023-02-23 | House | to Committee on Committees (H) |
2023-02-23 | House | received in House |
2023-02-22 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 31-3-1 with Committee Substitute (1) |
2023-02-17 | Senate | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Wednesday, February 22, 2023 |
2023-02-16 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2023-02-15 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute (1) |
2023-02-09 | Senate | to State & Local Government (S) |
2023-02-07 | Senate | to Committee on Committees (S) |
2023-02-07 | Senate | introduced in Senate |
Subjects
Attorney General
Auditor of Public Accounts
Charitable Organizations and Institutions
Public Authorities
Public Records and Reports
Short Titles and Popular Names
Auditor of Public Accounts
Charitable Organizations and Institutions
Public Authorities
Public Records and Reports
Short Titles and Popular Names