KY SB65 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 25 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-25 - signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 12)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [MS Word]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 25 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-25 - signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 12)
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [MS Word]
Summary
Amend KRS 210.235 to specify additional conditions under which patient records may be disclosed.
Title
AN ACT relating to mental health records.
Sponsors
Sen. Alice Kerr [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-25 | Senate | signed by Governor (Acts, ch. 12) |
2014-03-14 | Senate | delivered to Governor |
2014-03-14 | Senate | enrolled, signed by each presiding officer |
2014-03-14 | Senate | received in Senate |
2014-03-13 | House | 3rd reading, passed 99-0 |
2014-03-11 | House | posted for passage in the Consent Orders of the Day for Thursday, March 13, 2014 |
2014-03-07 | House | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2014-03-06 | House | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar |
2014-03-04 | House | posted in committee |
2014-02-25 | House | to Health & Welfare (H) |
2014-02-24 | House | received in House |
2014-02-24 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 35-0 |
2014-02-21 | Senate | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Monday, February 24, 2014 |
2014-02-20 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2014-02-19 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Consent Calendar |
2014-01-30 | Senate | reassigned to Health & Welfare (S) |
2014-01-15 | Senate | to Judiciary (S) |
2014-01-09 | Senate | introduced in Senate |
Kentucky State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/14RS/SB65.htm |
Text | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/14RS/SB65/bill.doc |
Supplement | http://www.lrc.ky.gov/record/14RS/SB65/vote_history.pdf |