KY SB90 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 27 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-01 - to Appropriations & Revenue (H)
Pending: House Appropriations and Revenue Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 27 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-01 - to Appropriations & Revenue (H)
Pending: House Appropriations and Revenue Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
Amend KRS 15.420 to differentiate between a local police officer and a state police officer and to further define which state employees are state police officers; amend KRS 15.460 to increase the annual supplement for each qualified police officer to $4,000, beginning July 1, 2018, to provide each unit of government an administrative expense reimbursement in an amount equal to 7.65% of the total annual supplement received greater than $3,100 for each qualified local police officer, but not more than a total of $525,000 for each fiscal year, to provide that a conservation officer is a participant in the Kentucky Law Enforcement Program Fund but require that the annual training stipend disbursed to a conservation officer shall be paid from the game and fish fund; amend KRS 95A.250 to increase the annual supplement for each qualified professional firefighter to $4,000, beginning July 1, 2018, and to provide each unit of government an administrative expense reimbursement in an amount equal to 7.65% of the total annual supplement received greater than $3,100 for each qualified professional firefighter, but not more than a total of $250,000 for each fiscal year; amend KRS 95A.262 to increase the allotment to certain volunteer fire departments to $11,000 annually to each qualifying department; amend KRS 150.150 to allow funds in the game and fish fund to be used to pay the annual supplement to conservation officers; make various conforming amendments; APPROPRIATION; EMERGENCY.
Title
AN ACT relating to the law enforcement and firefighters foundation programs, making an appropriation therefor, and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Sen. Danny Carroll [R] | Sen. C.B. Embry [R] | Sen. Dan Seum [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading W/SCS 1 RSN# 466 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 466 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 466 (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-01 | House | to Appropriations & Revenue (H) |
2018-02-27 | House | received in House |
2018-02-26 | Senate | 3rd reading, passed 36-0 with Committee Substitute (1) |
2018-02-23 | Senate | posted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Monday, February 26, 2018 |
2018-02-21 | Senate | 2nd reading, to Rules |
2018-02-20 | Senate | reported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar with Committee Substitute (1) |
2018-01-18 | Senate | to Appropriations & Revenue (S) |
2018-01-17 | Senate | introduced in Senate |