KY SB91 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 19 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-02-21 - to Health and Family Services (H)
Pending: House Health and Family Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Create a new section of KRS Chapter 216B to define terms and to require the Cabinet for Health and Family Services to promulgate administrative regulations requiring the use of a smoke evacuation system during any surgical procedure that is likely to produce surgical smoke; amend KRS 216B.990 to establish penalties.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT relating to surgical smoke evacuation.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RSN# 1236 (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-21Houseto Health and Family Services (H)
2020-02-19Housereceived in House
2020-02-18Senate3rd reading, passed 32-0
2020-02-14Senateposted for passage in the Regular Orders of the Day for Tuesday, February 18, 2020
2020-02-13Senate2nd reading, to Rules
2020-02-12Senatereported favorably, 1st reading, to Calendar
2020-01-16Senateto Health & Welfare (S)
2020-01-14Senateintroduced in Senate

Subjects


Kentucky State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback