KY SR274 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 15 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-15 - adopted by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 15 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-15 - adopted by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Declare March 13, 2020, to be Social Determinants of Addiction Recovery Day.
Title
A RESOLUTION declaring March 13, 2020, as the Social Determinants of Addiction Recovery Day.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-15 | Senate | adopted by voice vote |
2020-03-17 | Senate | to Senate Floor |
2020-03-12 | Senate | introduced in Senate |
Subjects
Kentucky State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://apps.legislature.ky.gov/record/20RS/sr274.html |
Text | https://apps.legislature.ky.gov/recorddocuments/bill/20RS/sr274/orig_bill.pdf |