LA HB1 | 2017 | 2nd Special Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 26 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-26 - Effective date: 07/01/17.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 26 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-26 - Effective date: 07/01/17.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Provides for the ordinary operating expenses of state government for Fiscal Year 2017-2018 (Item #2)
Title
Provides for the ordinary operating expenses of state government for Fiscal Year 2017-2018 (Item #2)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-16 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 1 FINAL PASSAGE (#12) (Y: 26 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-06-14 - House - House Vote on HB 1 FINAL PASSAGE (#12) (Y: 56 N: 46 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-06-14 - House - House Vote on HB 1 AMENDMENT # 79 BY ABRAHAM MOTION TO ADOPT (#10) (Y: 49 N: 51 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2017-06-14 - House - House Vote on HB 1 AMENDMENT # 69 BY HAVARD MOTION TO ADOPT (#9) (Y: 63 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-06-14 - House - House Vote on HB 1 AMENDMENT # 72 BY SCHEXNAYDER MOTION TO ADOPT (#8) (Y: 21 N: 75 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [FAIL]
2017-06-14 - House - House Vote on HB 1 AMENDMENT # 73 BY LEGER MOTION TO ADOPT (#7) (Y: 53 N: 50 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-06-14 - House - House Vote on HB 1 AMENDMENT # 75 BY MCFARLAND MOTION TO ADOPT (#6) (Y: 33 N: 68 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2017-06-14 - House - House Vote on HB 1 FINAL PASSAGE (#12) (Y: 56 N: 46 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-06-14 - House - House Vote on HB 1 AMENDMENT # 79 BY ABRAHAM MOTION TO ADOPT (#10) (Y: 49 N: 51 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2017-06-14 - House - House Vote on HB 1 AMENDMENT # 69 BY HAVARD MOTION TO ADOPT (#9) (Y: 63 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-06-14 - House - House Vote on HB 1 AMENDMENT # 72 BY SCHEXNAYDER MOTION TO ADOPT (#8) (Y: 21 N: 75 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [FAIL]
2017-06-14 - House - House Vote on HB 1 AMENDMENT # 73 BY LEGER MOTION TO ADOPT (#7) (Y: 53 N: 50 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-06-14 - House - House Vote on HB 1 AMENDMENT # 75 BY MCFARLAND MOTION TO ADOPT (#6) (Y: 33 N: 68 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-26 | House | Effective date: 07/01/17. |
2017-06-26 | House | Signed by the Governor with one or more line-item vetoes. Becomes Act No. 3. |
2017-06-16 | House | Sent to the Governor for executive approval. |
2017-06-16 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2017-06-16 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2017-06-16 | House | Received from the Senate without amendments. |
2017-06-16 | Senate | Read by title, passed by a vote of 26 yeas and 9 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2017-06-16 | Senate | Rules suspended. |
2017-06-15 | Senate | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2017-06-15 | Senate | Reported favorably. Rules suspended. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2017-06-14 | Senate | Received in the Senate; read by title Rules suspended. Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Finance. |
2017-06-14 | House | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 56, nays 46. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2017-06-13 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 06/14/17. |
2017-06-13 | House | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2017-06-13 | House | Rules suspended. |
2017-06-13 | House | Reported with amendments (15-6). |
2017-06-12 | House | Read by title, rules suspended, referred to the Committee on Appropriations. |
2017-06-09 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Appropriations. |
2017-06-09 | House | Prefiled. |