LA HB1213 | 2012 | Regular Session
Note: Replaces legislation HB664
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-8-1)
Status: Passed on June 14 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-14 - Effective date: October 1, 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-8-1)
Status: Passed on June 14 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-06-14 - Effective date: October 1, 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Provides with respect to the purchase of alternative fuel vehicles for the state fleet (EN SEE FISC NOTE GF EX See Note)
Title
Provides with respect to the purchase of alternative fuel vehicles for the state fleet (EN SEE FISC NOTE GF EX See Note)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-06-01 - House - House Vote on HB 1213, CONCUR SENATE AMENDMENTS (#1502) (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2012-05-31 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 1213, FINAL PASSAGE (#1600) (Y: 32 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2012-05-16 - House - House Vote on HB 1213, FINAL PASSAGE (#895) (Y: 90 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2012-05-31 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 1213, FINAL PASSAGE (#1600) (Y: 32 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2012-05-16 - House - House Vote on HB 1213, FINAL PASSAGE (#895) (Y: 90 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-06-14 | Effective date: October 1, 2012. | |
2012-06-14 | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 833. | |
2012-06-04 | Sent to the Governor for executive approval. | |
2012-06-04 | Signed by the President of the Senate. | |
2012-06-03 | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. | |
2012-06-01 | Read by title, roll called, yeas 93, nays 0, Senate amendments concurred in. | |
2012-05-31 | Scheduled for concurrence on 6/1/2012. | |
2012-05-31 | Received from the Senate with amendments. | |
2012-05-31 | Rules suspended. The amended bill was read by title, passed by a vote of 32 yeas and 3 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. | |
2012-05-30 | Reported with Legislative Bureau amendments which were read and adopted. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. | |
2012-05-29 | Rules suspended. Reported with amendments. Rules suspended. Committee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau. | |
2012-05-21 | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Finance. | |
2012-05-17 | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. | |
2012-05-16 | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 90, nays 3. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. | |
2012-05-10 | Scheduled for floor debate on 5/16/2012. | |
2012-05-10 | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar. | |
2012-05-09 | Read by title, substitute title adopted, lies over in the same order of business, substitute for HB No. 664 reported by the Committee on Appropriations (19-0). |
Same As/Similar To
HB664 (Replaces) 2012-05-09 - Becomes HB No. 1213.