LA HB136 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 16-7-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 18 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-23 - Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 18 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-23 - Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Designates a portion of Highway 175 in Mansfield, Louisiana, in DeSoto Parish as the "Jerius Marshall Highway" and a portion of Highway 133 in Start, Louisiana, in Richland Parish as the "Luke Letlow Memorial Highway"
Title
Designates a portion of Highway 175 in Mansfield, Louisiana, in DeSoto Parish as the "Jerius Marshall Highway" and a portion of Highway 133 in Start, Louisiana, in Richland Parish as the "Luke Letlow Memorial Highway"
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-18 - House - House Vote on HB 136 FINAL PASSAGE (#12) (Y: 103 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-23 | Senate | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2024-04-22 | Senate | Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2024-04-17 | Senate | Reported favorably. |
2024-03-19 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works. |
2024-03-18 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2024-03-18 | House | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 103, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2024-03-13 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 03/18/2024. |
2024-03-13 | House | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2024-03-12 | House | Reported with amendments (12-0). |
2024-03-11 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works. |
2024-02-23 | House | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 2/23/2024. |
2024-02-23 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works. |
2024-02-23 | House | Prefiled. |