LA HB146 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 20 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-03-25 - Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works.
Pending: Senate Transportation, Highways & Public Works Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 20 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-03-25 - Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works.
Pending: Senate Transportation, Highways & Public Works Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Provides relative to board appointments for the Sabine River Authority
Title
Provides relative to board appointments for the Sabine River Authority
Sponsors
Rep. Les Farnum [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-03-19 - House - House Vote on HB 146 FINAL PASSAGE (#25) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-25 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works. |
2024-03-20 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2024-03-19 | House | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 99, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2024-03-18 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 03/19/2024. |
2024-03-18 | House | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2024-03-13 | House | Reported favorably (10-0). |
2024-03-11 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works. |
2024-02-23 | House | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 2/23/2024. |
2024-02-23 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works. |
2024-02-23 | House | Prefiled. |