LA HB15 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 17 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-30 - Read by title. Recommitted to the Committee on Finance.
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 17 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-30 - Read by title. Recommitted to the Committee on Finance.
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Provides for the reemployment of retired police officers of the Municipal Police Employees' Retirement System (RE1 INCREASE APV)
Title
Provides for the reemployment of retired police officers of the Municipal Police Employees' Retirement System (RE1 INCREASE APV)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-17 - House - House Vote on HB 15 FINAL PASSAGE (#560) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-30 | Senate | Read by title. Recommitted to the Committee on Finance. |
2024-04-30 | Senate | Senate Committee amendments read and adopted. |
2024-04-29 | Senate | Reported with amendments. |
2024-04-22 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Retirement. |
2024-04-17 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2024-04-17 | House | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 100, nays 0. The bill, having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, was finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2024-04-16 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 04/17/2024. |
2024-04-15 | House | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2024-04-11 | House | Reported with amendments (10-0). |
2024-03-11 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Retirement. |
2024-01-19 | House | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 1/19/2024. |
2024-01-19 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Retirement. |
2024-01-19 | House | Prefiled. |