LA HB2 | 2017 | 2nd Special Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 29 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-29 - Effective date: 06/29/17.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 29 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-29 - Effective date: 06/29/17.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Provides for the comprehensive Capital Outlay budget (Item #3)
Title
Provides for the comprehensive Capital Outlay budget (Item #3)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-16 - House - House Vote on HB 2 CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENTS (#20) (Y: 83 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2017-06-16 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 2 FINAL PASSAGE (#15) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-06-14 - House - House Vote on HB 2 FINAL PASSAGE (#16) (Y: 82 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-06-14 - House - House Vote on HB 2 AMENDMENT # 62 BY HUNTER MOTION TO ADOPT (#15) (Y: 26 N: 71 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [FAIL]
2017-06-16 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 2 FINAL PASSAGE (#15) (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-06-14 - House - House Vote on HB 2 FINAL PASSAGE (#16) (Y: 82 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-06-14 - House - House Vote on HB 2 AMENDMENT # 62 BY HUNTER MOTION TO ADOPT (#15) (Y: 26 N: 71 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-29 | House | Effective date: 06/29/17. |
2017-06-29 | House | Signed by the Governor with one or more line-item vetoes. Becomes Act No. 4. |
2017-06-16 | House | Sent to the Governor for executive approval. |
2017-06-16 | Senate | Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title, passed by a vote of 32 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2017-06-16 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2017-06-16 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2017-06-16 | House | Read by title, roll called, yeas 83, nays 8, Senate amendments concurred in. |
2017-06-16 | House | Received from the Senate with amendments. |
2017-06-16 | Senate | Rules suspended. |
2017-06-15 | Senate | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2017-06-15 | Senate | Reported with amendments. Rules suspended. Committee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2017-06-14 | Senate | Received in the Senate; read by title Rules suspended. Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs. |
2017-06-14 | House | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 82, nays 20. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2017-06-14 | House | Called from the calendar. |
2017-06-14 | House | Read by title, returned to the calendar. |
2017-06-13 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 06/14/17. |
2017-06-13 | House | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2017-06-13 | House | Rules suspended. |
2017-06-13 | House | Reported favorably (14-0). |
2017-06-12 | House | Read by title, rules suspended, referred to the Committee on Ways and Means. |