LA HB2 | 2024 | 2nd Extraordinary Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on March 6 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-06 - Effective date: 04/29/2024.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on March 6 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-06 - Effective date: 04/29/2024.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Provides for immunity from civil liability under certain circumstances for peace officers and public entities that employ or appoint peace officers (Item #13) (EN DECREASE SG EX See Note)
Title
Provides for immunity from civil liability under certain circumstances for peace officers and public entities that employ or appoint peace officers (Item #13) (EN DECREASE SG EX See Note)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-29 - House - House Vote on HB 2 CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENTS (#81) (Y: 73 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2024-02-29 - House - House Vote on HB 2 CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENTS (#81) (Y: 72 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2024-02-28 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 2 FINAL PASSAGE (#55) (Y: 26 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-02-22 - House - House Vote on HB 2 FINAL PASSAGE (#28) (Y: 73 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-19 - House - House Vote on HB 2 CIVIL LAW (#5) (Y: 74 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2024-02-29 - House - House Vote on HB 2 CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENTS (#81) (Y: 72 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2024-02-28 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 2 FINAL PASSAGE (#55) (Y: 26 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-02-22 - House - House Vote on HB 2 FINAL PASSAGE (#28) (Y: 73 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-19 - House - House Vote on HB 2 CIVIL LAW (#5) (Y: 74 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-06 | House | Effective date: 04/29/2024. |
2024-03-06 | House | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 16. |
2024-02-29 | House | Sent to the Governor for executive approval. |
2024-02-29 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2024-02-29 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2024-02-29 | House | Read by title, roll called, yeas 72, nays 26, Senate amendments concurred in. |
2024-02-28 | House | Scheduled for concurrence on 02/29/2024. |
2024-02-28 | House | Received from the Senate with amendments. |
2024-02-28 | Senate | Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title, passed by a vote of 26 yeas and 11 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2024-02-27 | Senate | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2024-02-26 | Senate | Reported with amendments. Rules suspended. Committee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2024-02-25 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary B. |
2024-02-22 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2024-02-22 | House | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 73, nays 31. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2024-02-21 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 02/22/2024. |
2024-02-21 | House | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2024-02-20 | House | Reported with amendments (13-0). |
2024-02-19 | House | Read by title, rules suspended, referred to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure. |
2024-02-09 | House | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 2/9/2024. |
2024-02-08 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure. |
2024-02-08 | House | Prefiled. |