LA HB200 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 24 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-29 - Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Labor and Industrial Relations.
Pending: Senate Labor & Industrial Relations Committee
Hearing: May 8 @ 1:00 pm in Room C
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 24 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-29 - Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Labor and Industrial Relations.
Pending: Senate Labor & Industrial Relations Committee
Hearing: May 8 @ 1:00 pm in Room C
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Provides relative to past payments of workers' compensation premiums
Title
Provides relative to past payments of workers' compensation premiums
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-24 - House - House Vote on HB 200 FINAL PASSAGE (#703) (Y: 76 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-29 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Labor and Industrial Relations. |
2024-04-24 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2024-04-24 | House | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 76, nays 19. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2024-04-23 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 04/24/2024. |
2024-04-22 | House | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2024-04-18 | House | Reported with amendments (9-0). |
2024-03-11 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Labor and Industrial Relations. |
2024-02-26 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Labor and Industrial Relations. |
2024-02-26 | House | Prefiled. |