LA HB212 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 25 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-02 - Withdrawn prior to introduction.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 25 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-02 - Withdrawn prior to introduction.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Creates and provides for a program to provide state funding for the education of students not enrolled in public school
Title
Creates and provides for a program to provide state funding for the education of students not enrolled in public school
Sponsors
Rep. Mark Wright [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-02 | House | Withdrawn prior to introduction. |
2021-03-26 | House | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/26/2021. |
2021-03-25 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Education. |
2021-03-25 | House | Prefiled. |