LA HB215 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 1 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-05-01 - Received in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 1 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-05-01 - Received in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Provides relative to the classified police service in Morgan City
Title
Provides relative to the classified police service in Morgan City
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-05-01 - House - House Vote on HB 215 FINAL PASSAGE (#821) (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-01 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2024-05-01 | House | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 92, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2024-04-30 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/01/2024. |
2024-04-30 | House | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2024-04-29 | House | Reported favorably (16-0). |
2024-04-03 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Municipal, Parochial and Cultural Affairs. |
2024-04-02 | House | Read by title. Lies over under the rules. |
2024-03-11 | House | Prefiled. To be introduced at a later date. |
2024-02-26 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Municipal, Parochial and Cultural Affairs. |
2024-02-26 | House | Prefiled. |