LA HB236 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 17 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-05-06 - Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 17 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-05-06 - Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Provides for evaluations in child custody proceedings (RE1 SEE FISC NOTE LF EX See Note)
Title
Provides for evaluations in child custody proceedings (RE1 SEE FISC NOTE LF EX See Note)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-16 - House - House Vote on HB 236 FINAL PASSAGE (#551) (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-06 | Senate | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2024-05-01 | Senate | Committee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2024-04-30 | Senate | Reported with amendments. |
2024-04-22 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary A. |
2024-04-17 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2024-04-16 | House | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 93, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2024-04-16 | House | Called from the calendar. |
2024-04-15 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 04/16/2024. |
2024-04-15 | House | Notice given. |
2024-04-15 | House | Read by title, returned to the calendar. |
2024-04-15 | House | Called from the calendar. |
2024-04-09 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 04/15/2024. |
2024-04-09 | House | Notice given. |
2024-04-04 | House | Read by title, returned to the calendar. |
2024-04-03 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 04/04/2024. |
2024-04-03 | House | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2024-04-02 | House | Reported favorably (8-0-1). |
2024-03-11 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure. |
2024-02-27 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure. |
2024-02-27 | House | Prefiled. |