LA HB35 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - Becomes HB 967.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-15 - Becomes HB 967.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides for the reemployment of retirees of the Teachers' Retirement System of Louisiana in critical shortage positions (OR INCREASE APV)
Title
Provides for the reemployment of retirees of the Teachers' Retirement System of Louisiana in critical shortage positions (OR INCREASE APV)
Sponsors
Rep. Neil Riser [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-15 | House | Becomes HB 967. |
2024-04-11 | House | Reported by substitute (11-0). |
2024-04-03 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Retirement. |
2024-04-02 | House | Read by title. Lies over under the rules. |
2024-01-26 | House | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 1/26/2024. |
2024-01-25 | House | Prefiled. To be introduced at a later date. |