LA HB356 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-6-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 3 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-08 - Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary C.
Pending: Senate Judiciary C Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 3 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-08 - Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary C.
Pending: Senate Judiciary C Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Provides for time limitations for prosecution of third degree rape
Title
Provides for time limitations for prosecution of third degree rape
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-02 - House - House Vote on HB 356 FINAL PASSAGE (#193) (Y: 103 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-08 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary C. |
2024-04-03 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2024-04-02 | House | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 103, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2024-03-27 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 04/02/2024. |
2024-03-27 | House | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2024-03-26 | House | Reported favorably (9-0). |
2024-03-11 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice. |
2024-02-29 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice. |
2024-02-29 | House | Prefiled. |