LA HB361 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 28 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-28 - Effective date: August 15, 2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 28 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-28 - Effective date: August 15, 2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Revises provisions relative to access to accident reports
Title
Revises provisions relative to access to accident reports
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-06-23 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 361, ADOPT (#1019) (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2011-06-23 - House - House Vote on HB 361, MOTION TO ADOPT (#925) (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2011-06-21 - House - House Vote on HB 361, REJECT SENATE AMENDMENTS (#830) (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2011-06-20 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 361, FINAL PASSAGE (#754) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-06-06 - House - House Vote on HB 361, FINAL PASSAGE (#431) (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2011-06-23 - House - House Vote on HB 361, MOTION TO ADOPT (#925) (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2011-06-21 - House - House Vote on HB 361, REJECT SENATE AMENDMENTS (#830) (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2011-06-20 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 361, FINAL PASSAGE (#754) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-06-06 - House - House Vote on HB 361, FINAL PASSAGE (#431) (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-28 | Effective date: August 15, 2011. | |
2011-06-28 | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 280. | |
2011-06-24 | Sent to the Governor for executive approval. | |
2011-06-23 | Signed by the President of the Senate on June 24. | |
2011-06-23 | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. | |
2011-06-23 | Notice of Senate adoption of Conference Committee Report. | |
2011-06-23 | Conference Committee Report read; adopted by a vote of 33 yeas and 0 nays. | |
2011-06-23 | Notice House adopted the Conference Committee Report. | |
2011-06-23 | Conference Committee Report read, roll called, yeas 90, nays 0. The Conference Committee Report was adopted. | |
2011-06-22 | Scheduled for floor debate on 6/23/2011. | |
2011-06-22 | Conference Committee report received. Lies over under the rules. | |
2011-06-22 | Conference committee report received. | |
2011-06-22 | Notice of Senate conferees appointed. | |
2011-06-22 | Notice House Conference Committee members appointed. | |
2011-06-22 | Senate conference committee members appointed: Martiny, LaFleur, and Murray. | |
2011-06-21 | House conferees appointed: Roy, Rosalind Jones, and Abramson. | |
2011-06-21 | Notice House rejected Senate amendments. | |
2011-06-21 | Read by title, roll called, yeas 94, nays 0, Senate amendments rejected, conference committee appointment pending. | |
2011-06-20 | Scheduled for concurrence on 6/21/2011. | |
2011-06-20 | Received from the Senate with amendments. | |
2011-06-20 | Rules suspended. Senate floor amendments were read and adopted. The amended bill was read by title, finally passed by a vote of 38 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. | |
2011-06-19 | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. | |
2011-06-16 | Committee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau. | |
2011-06-15 | Reported with amendments. | |
2011-06-07 | Rules suspended. Read by title. Recommitted to the Committee on Judiciary B. | |
2011-06-07 | Received in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read first and second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary A. | |
2011-06-06 | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 95, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. | |
2011-05-27 | Scheduled for floor debate on 6/6/2011. | |
2011-05-26 | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar. | |
2011-05-25 | Reported with amendments (11-0-1) (Regular). | |
2011-04-25 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Judiciary. | |
2011-04-18 | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 4/18/2011. | |
2011-04-14 | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Judiciary. | |
2011-04-14 | Prefiled. |