LA HB373 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 8-4)
Status: Engrossed on April 17 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-22 - Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary B.
Pending: Senate Judiciary B Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 17 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-22 - Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary B.
Pending: Senate Judiciary B Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Provides relative to veterans' service offices (EG SEE FISC NOTE LF EX See Note)
Title
Provides relative to veterans' service offices (EG SEE FISC NOTE LF EX See Note)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-17 - House - House Vote on HB 373 FINAL PASSAGE (#574) (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-22 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary B. |
2024-04-17 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2024-04-17 | House | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 102, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2024-04-16 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 04/17/2024. |
2024-04-15 | House | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2024-04-11 | House | Reported favorably (15-0). |
2024-03-11 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Judiciary. |
2024-02-29 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Judiciary. |
2024-02-29 | House | Prefiled. |