LA HB388 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on April 25 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-06-06 - Read by title, returned to the calendar.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 25 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-06-06 - Read by title, returned to the calendar.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Makes the state of La. a party to an interstate compact entitled the "Agreement Among the States to Elect the President by National Popular Vote" (EG NO IMPACT EX See Note)
Title
Makes the state of La. a party to an interstate compact entitled the "Agreement Among the States to Elect the President by National Popular Vote" (EG NO IMPACT EX See Note)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-06 | Read by title, returned to the calendar. | |
2011-05-27 | Scheduled for floor debate on 6/6/2011. | |
2011-05-25 | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar. | |
2011-05-24 | Reported favorably (14-0) (Regular). | |
2011-04-25 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs. | |
2011-04-18 | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 4/18/2011. | |
2011-04-14 | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs. | |
2011-04-14 | Prefiled. |