LA HB4 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 8 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-29 - Read by title. Recommitted to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs.
Pending: Senate Revenue & Fiscal Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 8 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-29 - Read by title. Recommitted to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs.
Pending: Senate Revenue & Fiscal Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Provides for an increase in wireless service charges for 911 services provided by the Terrebonne Parish Communications District (EG +$588,000 LF RV See Note)
Title
Provides for an increase in wireless service charges for 911 services provided by the Terrebonne Parish Communications District (EG +$588,000 LF RV See Note)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-04 - House - House Vote on HB 4 FINAL PASSAGE (#272) (Y: 95 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-29 | Senate | Read by title. Recommitted to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs. |
2024-04-24 | Senate | Reported favorably. |
2024-04-09 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Local and Municipal Affairs. |
2024-04-08 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2024-04-04 | House | Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 95, nays 6. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2024-04-03 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 04/04/2024. |
2024-04-03 | House | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2024-04-02 | House | Reported favorably (14-0). |
2024-03-11 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Municipal, Parochial and Cultural Affairs. |
2024-01-19 | House | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 1/19/2024. |
2024-01-15 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Municipal, Parochial and Cultural Affairs. |
2024-01-15 | House | Prefiled. |