LA HB402 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 1 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-18 - Notice removed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 1 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-18 - Notice removed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Provides relative to habitual offenders (EG SEE FISC NOTE GF EX See Note)
Title
Provides relative to habitual offenders (EG SEE FISC NOTE GF EX See Note)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-18 | House | Notice removed |
2021-05-18 | House | Read by title, returned to the calendar. |
2021-05-18 | House | Called from the calendar. |
2021-05-12 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/18/2021. |
2021-05-12 | House | Notice given. |
2021-05-12 | House | Read by title, returned to the calendar. |
2021-05-06 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/12/2021. |
2021-05-06 | House | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2021-05-05 | House | Reported favorably (9-0). |
2021-04-12 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice. |
2021-04-02 | House | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 4/2/2021. |
2021-04-01 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice. |
2021-04-01 | House | Prefiled. |