LA HB413 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 9-5)
Status: Introduced on February 29 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-30 - Scheduled for floor debate on 05/01/2024.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 29 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-30 - Scheduled for floor debate on 05/01/2024.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Provides for the financial security of surviving spouses and dependent children of deceased firemen in certain circumstances (EG INCREASE GF EX See Note)
Title
Provides for the financial security of surviving spouses and dependent children of deceased firemen in certain circumstances (EG INCREASE GF EX See Note)
Sponsors
Rep. Joseph Stagni [R] | Rep. Beth Billings [R] | Rep. Kim Carver [R] | Rep. Vincent Cox [R] |
Rep. Jessica Domangue [R] | Rep. Les Farnum [R] | Rep. Foy Gadberry [R] | Rep. Alonzo Knox [D] |
Rep. Rodney Lyons [D] | Rep. Shane Mack [R] | Rep. Pat Moore [D] | Rep. Candace Newell [D] |
Rep. Charles Owen [R] | Rep. Rashid Young [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-30 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/01/2024. |
2024-04-30 | House | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. |
2024-04-29 | House | Reported favorably (16-0). |
2024-04-15 | House | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, recommitted to the Committee on Appropriations. |
2024-04-11 | House | Reported with amendments (14-0). |
2024-03-11 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Municipal, Parochial and Cultural Affairs. |
2024-02-29 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Municipal, Parochial and Cultural Affairs. |
2024-02-29 | House | Prefiled. |