LA HB421 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 10 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-10 - Effective date: August 1, 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 10 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-10 - Effective date: August 1, 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Adds a fee at license renewal for contractors dedicated to certain schools of construction management or construction technology (EN INCREASE SG RV See Note)
Title
Adds a fee at license renewal for contractors dedicated to certain schools of construction management or construction technology (EN INCREASE SG RV See Note)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-06-04 - House - House Vote on HB 421 CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENTS (#842) (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2013-06-03 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 421 FINAL PASSAGE (#909) (Y: 37 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-05-21 - House - House Vote on HB 421 FINAL PASSAGE (#512) (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2013-06-03 - Senate - Senate Vote on HB 421 FINAL PASSAGE (#909) (Y: 37 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-05-21 - House - House Vote on HB 421 FINAL PASSAGE (#512) (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-10 | House | Effective date: August 1, 2013. |
2013-06-10 | House | Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 195. |
2013-06-06 | House | Sent to the Governor for executive approval. |
2013-06-06 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate. |
2013-06-05 | House | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. |
2013-06-04 | House | Read by title, roll called, yeas 93, nays 0. The Senate amendments, having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, were concurred in. |
2013-06-03 | House | Scheduled for concurrence on 6/4/2013. |
2013-06-03 | House | Received from the Senate with amendments. |
2013-06-03 | Senate | Rules suspended. Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title, passed by a vote of 37 yeas and 1 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. |
2013-06-01 | Senate | Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage. |
2013-05-31 | Senate | Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau. |
2013-05-31 | Senate | Rules suspended. Recalled from Committee. |
2013-05-30 | Senate | Read by title. Recommitted to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs. |
2013-05-30 | Senate | Senate Committee amendments read and adopted. |
2013-05-29 | Senate | Reported with amendments. |
2013-05-22 | Senate | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Consumer Protection and International Affairs. |
2013-05-21 | Senate | Received in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |
2013-05-21 | House | Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 92, nays 0. The bill, having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, was finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate. |
2013-05-16 | House | Scheduled for floor debate on 5/21/2013. |
2013-05-14 | House | Read by title, passed to 3rd reading - regular calendar. |
2013-05-13 | House | Reported favorably (13-0) (Regular). |
2013-05-07 | House | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, recommitted to the Committee on Appropriations. |
2013-05-06 | House | Reported with amendments (10-0) (Regular). To be recommitted to the Committee on Appropriations. |
2013-04-08 | House | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Commerce. |
2013-04-01 | House | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 4/1/2013. |
2013-03-28 | House | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Commerce. |
2013-03-28 | House | Prefiled. |